Parviz v. Kratz et al
Plaintiff: Parviz Izadjoo
Defendant: Owen Kratz and Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv02213
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINAL JUDGMENT entered. Case terminated on 5/1/17(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered: The defendants motion to dismiss, (Docket Entry No. 28), is granted. The dismissal is without prejudice and with leave to amend no later than March 17, 2017. The amended pleading must state with particularity the material misrepresentations made by the individual defendants (no group pleading) and a basis for scienter beyond signatures on SEC filings and unspecific anonymous sources.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING 10 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, Lead Counsel. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parviz v. Kratz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parviz Izadjoo
Represented By: Thomas E Bilek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?