Nelson v. ATT Mobility
Plaintiff: Nelson and Tia Nelson
Defendant: ATT Mobility
Case Number: 4:2016cv00313
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part #14 MOTION to Dismiss This action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
June 9, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by ATT Mobility, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Judge's Procedures Case Law)(Lindberg, Erika)
April 25, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 4/25/2017. #9 Motion to dismiss is denied for reasons stated on the record. Plaintiff must properly serve Defendant within 30 days. Appearances:Tia Nelson (pro se). Rachel Michelle Smith.(Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz)(Law Clerk: S. Elsner), filed.(arrivera, 4)
April 19, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Re-setting as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 4/25/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. TIME CHANGE ONLY. (arrivera, 4)
March 24, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Setting as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
March 15, 2017 Filing 11 REPLY in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by ATT Mobility. (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures Case Law)(Smith, Rachel)
March 6, 2017 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Tia Nelson. (gclair, 4)
October 14, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by ATT Mobility, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Rachel)
June 14, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/14/2016. Plaintiff must perfect service before the case can move forward. Appearances:(Law Clerk: K. Shephard) Erika Lindberg f/Deft; Tia Nelson-Pro Se Plaintiff. Rachel Michelle Smith.(Court Reporter: Kathy Miller), filed.(sloewe, 4)
May 21, 2016 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) by ATT Mobility, filed.(Smith, Rachel)
May 20, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) by ATT Mobility, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Rachel)
May 12, 2016 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to ATT Mobility served on 2/8/2016, answer due 2/29/2016, filed.(thanniable, 4)
May 11, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Resetting as to #4 Notice Regarding Initial Conference. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset to 6/14/2016 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
May 6, 2016 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe, 4)
February 8, 2016 Filing 3 Return of Service Unexecuted as to ATT Mobility re: Summons, filed. No date of service specified No USPS tracking number(smurdock, 4)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2016 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison( Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(blacy, 4)
February 5, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATT Mobility (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Tia Nelson.(blacy, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. ATT Mobility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATT Mobility
Represented By: Erika Jean Lindberg
Represented By: Rachel Michelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tia Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?