Nguyen et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Tu Nguyen and Chau Ho Huynh
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2016cv01523
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Melinda Harmon
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AND OPINION re: GRANTING 22 MOTION to Amend 21 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Courts Order granting Defendants Motions to Dismiss (Document No. 21) is WITHDRAWN. Defendants Motio n to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (Document No. 14) is DENIED. Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Document No. 6) is GRANTED. The case is DISMISSED with PREJUDICE to refiling. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER AND OPINION, granting 6 Motion to Dismiss. Case terminated on 6/26/2017; granting 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER granting 4 MOTION to Vacate. Defendant shall have 20 days from the date of this Order to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tu Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chau Ho Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Philip W Danaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?