Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc. v. Noble Corporation plc et al
Plaintiff: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc.
Defendant: Noble Corporation plc, Noble Corporation, Noble Drilling Americas LLC, Noble Drilling Exploration Company, Noble Drilling Holding LLC, Noble Drilling Services Inc., Noble Drilling (U.S.) LLC and Noble Drilling (U.S.) Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv00123
Filed: January 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 132 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Breach of Contract), 133 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, 4)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENIED 103 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Breach of Contract (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ( Status Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas)(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc. v. Noble Corporation plc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc.
Represented By: J. Reid Bumgarner
Represented By: Michael Steven McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Corporation plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Drilling Americas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Drilling Exploration Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Drilling Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Drilling Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Drilling (U.S.) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Drilling (U.S.) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?