Adams EMS, Inc. v. Azar
Plaintiff: Adams EMS, Inc.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 4:2018cv01443
Filed: May 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: Adams's statutory, due process, and ultra vires claims fail as a matter of law. The court grants Azar's motion for summary judgment, (Docket Entry No. 64), and denies Adams's motion for summary judgment, (Docket Entry No. 65). Fina judgment to be entered by separate order. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING 51 MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER entered Regarding Bond Issues. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER entered: This order takes effect July 11, 2018 and expires on July 25, 2018. Plaintiff must post the remaining bond of 25,000 by Sept. 10, 2018. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams EMS, Inc. v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adams EMS, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?