McCann

Appellant: Michael Andrew McCann
Case Number: 4:2018cv02505
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Brazoria
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2018 4 Appellant's BRIEF by Michael Andrew McCann, filed.(SamanthaWarda, 4)
August 14, 2018 *** Appeal filing fees due.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 14, 2018 3 Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018. On 8/14/2018, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned Judge Hughes, Civil Action 4:18-cv-2505. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. Parties notified, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 14, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The attached documents represent all designated items to be included as the Record on Appeal in this matter, filed. (Attachments: #1 18-33152 Record)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
July 19, 2018 1 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 7/17/2018, Michael Andrew McCann filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Lynn Hughes, Civil Action 4:18-cv-2505. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael Andrew McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?