Dowdy v. Titan Fitness LLC, a/k/a Titan Fitness, Inc. d/b/a Fitness Connection Baytown

Plaintiff: Helen Dowdy
Defendant: Titan Fitness LLC, a/k/a Titan Fitness, Inc. d/b/a Fitness Connection Baytown
Case Number: 4:2018cv02712
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 7 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Titan Fitness LLC, a/k/a Titan Fitness, Inc. d/b/a Fitness Connection Baytown, filed.(Smith, Patrick)
August 27, 2018 6 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Helen Dowdy, filed.(Henry, Carver)
August 24, 2018 5 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Titan Fitness LLC, a/k/a Titan Fitness, Inc. d/b/a Fitness Connection Baytown, filed.(Smith, Patrick)
August 24, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Titan Fitness LLC, a/k/a Titan Fitness, Inc. d/b/a Fitness Connection Baytown, filed.(Smith, Patrick)
August 13, 2018 3 Certificate of Service in Removed Action by Titan Fitness LLC, a/k/a Titan Fitness, Inc. d/b/a Fitness Connection Baytown, filed.(Smith, Patrick)
August 9, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 08:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st Judicial District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2018-43827 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20609959) filed by Titan Fitness LLC, a/k/a Titan Fitness, Inc. d/b/a Fitness Connection Baytown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowdy v. Titan Fitness LLC, a/k/a Titan Fitness, Inc. d/b/a Fitness Connection Baytown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Dowdy
Represented By: Kanan Beth Henry
Represented By: Carver Lee Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Fitness LLC, a/k/a Titan Fitness, Inc. d/b/a Fitness Connection Baytown
Represented By: Patrick Nichols Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?