Norris et al v. McKesson Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Gena Norris and Chuck Norris
Defendant: Bracco Imaging Group, Bracco Research USA, Inc., Acist Medical Systems, Inc., Bipso GMBH, Bracco Group, Merry X-Ray Chemical Corporation, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Takeda GMBH, Bracco Diagnostics Inc. and Bracco Imaging, S.P.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv02762
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 35 AGREED PROTOCOL REGARDING THE FORMAT OF PRODUCTION OF HARDCOPY DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Entry of Order.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
January 4, 2019 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Agreed Protective Order and ESI Protocol by Bracco Diagnostics Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Griffin, Elizabeth)
December 11, 2018 Filing 31 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Todd Alan Walburg as to Chuck Norris re: #30 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (jtabares, 1)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Todd A. Walburg to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
November 26, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Todd Alan Walburg to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Chuck Norris, Gena Norris, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/17/2018. (DesireeSillas, 4)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 10 days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2019 Pltf Expert Report due by 1/15/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 2/28/2020. Rebuttal Opinions due 3/15/2020 Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Mediation due by 4/30/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/15/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/15/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2020. Docket Call set for 9/23/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Pretrial conference held Appearances: Elizabeth Kamin. Appearances: Paul Scott Penticuff, Elizabeth Fitzgerald Griffin, Habib Nasrullah, Todd Alan Walburg. Ct Reporter: ERO. Docket control order to follow: ESI and Protective order due January 4, 2019.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
November 12, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed.(Nasrullah, Habib)
November 12, 2018 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed.(Nasrullah, Habib)
November 12, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Habib Nasrullah on behalf of McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. (Nasrullah, Habib)
November 12, 2018 Filing 23 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bracco Diagnostics Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Docket Control Order)(Walsh, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER to with Jury Demand by Bracco Diagnostics Inc., filed. (Walsh, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File.Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. must file its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs Complaint [Doc. # 20-1] as a new docket entry.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
October 4, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by Bracco Diagnostics Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Answer, #2 Proposed Order Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer)(Griffin, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for C. Brooks Cutler to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for C. Brooks Cutter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chuck Norris, Gena Norris, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2018. (dwilkerson, 3)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Thomas N. Sterchi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Paul S. Penticuff to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
August 24, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Paul S. Penticuff to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bracco Diagnostics Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2018. (Walsh, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Thomas N. Sterchi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bracco Diagnostics Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2018. (Walsh, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bracco Diagnostics Inc., filed.(Walsh, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bracco Diagnostics Inc. identifying Bracco U.S.A., Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Walsh, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Walsh, Elizabeth B. Kamin, Elizabeth F. Griffin on behalf of Bracco Diagnostics Inc., filed. (Walsh, Michael)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 Case transferred in from California Northern. Case Number 3:18-cv-04314; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
August 9, 2018 Transferring case electronically to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #7 Stipulation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Bracco Diagnostics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mooney, Brian) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 17, 2018 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #1 -2) by Bracco Diagnostics Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Bracco Diagnostics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Mooney, Brian) (Filed on 7/17/2018) Modified on 7/18/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bracco Diagnostics Inc. (Mooney, Brian) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Joseph Mooney (Mooney, Brian) (Filed on 7/17/2018) Modified on 7/18/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Jury Trial Demanded from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-17-562228. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-12519000). Filed by Bracco Diagnostics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mooney, Brian) (Filed on 7/17/2018) Modified on 7/18/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris et al v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bracco Imaging Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bracco Research USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acist Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bipso GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bracco Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merry X-Ray Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Emma Elizabeth Garrison
Represented By: Habib Nasrullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Represented By: Emma Elizabeth Garrison
Represented By: Habib Nasrullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bracco Diagnostics Inc.
Represented By: Brian Mooney
Represented By: Paul Scott Penticuff
Represented By: Peter Turcotte
Represented By: Thomas Sterchi
Represented By: Michael A Walsh
Represented By: Elizabeth Fitzgerald Griffin
Represented By: Thomas N Sterchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bracco Imaging, S.P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gena Norris
Represented By: Margot P. Cutter
Represented By: Todd Alan Walburg
Represented By: C. Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Norris
Represented By: Margot P. Cutter
Represented By: Todd Alan Walburg
Represented By: C. Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?