TARGA TRANSPORT LLC v. Crosby Tugs LLC
Plaintiff: TARGA TRANSPORT LLC
Defendant: Crosby Tugs LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv03170
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #5 MOTION to Dismiss. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Case terminated on 10/9/2018. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 8, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by TARGA TRANSPORT LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2018. (Caflisch, Giorgio)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by TARGA TRANSPORT LLC, filed.(Caflisch, Giorgio)
September 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to Crosby Tugs LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(kpicota, 4)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/4/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(kpicotaadi, 4)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Crosby Tugs LLC, filed.(Caflisch, Giorgio)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crosby Tugs LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20823213) filed by TARGA TRANSPORT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Caflisch, Giorgio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TARGA TRANSPORT LLC v. Crosby Tugs LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARGA TRANSPORT LLC
Represented By: Giorgio George Caflisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Tugs LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?