Michael Green, as Trustee for The 2016 Wolf Trust v. Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a Bank of New York, f/k/a Irving Trust Company, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-7
Plaintiff: Michael Green, as Trustee for The 2016 Wolf Trust
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a Bank of New York, f/k/a Irving Trust Company, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-7
Case Number: 4:2018cv03171
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Kenneth S. Harter to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Kenneth S. Harter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Green, as Trustee for The 2016 Wolf Trust, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/12/2018. (dnoriega, 1)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a Bank of New York, f/k/a Irving Trust Company, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-7, filed.(Hord, Michael)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Michael Green, as Trustee for The 2016 Wolf Trust, filed.(Harter, Kenneth)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/28/2018 at 04:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(kpicotaadi, 4)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th Judicial District Court, Harris County, TX, case number 2018-56706 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20823224) filed by Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a Bank of New York, f/k/a Irving Trust Company, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-7. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit C-4, #8 Exhibit C-5, #9 Exhibit C-6, #10 Exhibit C-7, #11 Exhibit C-8, #12 Exhibit C-9, #13 Exhibit C-10, #14 Exhibit D, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hord, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Green, as Trustee for The 2016 Wolf Trust v. Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a Bank of New York, f/k/a Irving Trust Company, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, f/k/a Bank of New York, f/k/a Irving Trust Company, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-7
Represented By: Michael F Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Green, as Trustee for The 2016 Wolf Trust
Represented By: Kenneth S Harter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?