Peters v. Gateway Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Anthony Babatunde Peters
Defendant: Gateway Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv03280
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Anthony Babatunde Peters, filed.(Nguyen, Nhan)
October 2, 2018 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gateway Insurance Company identifying Atlas Financial Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Heard, Joseph)
October 2, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gateway Insurance Company, filed.(Heard, Joseph)
September 28, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Gateway Insurance Company, filed.(Heard, Joseph)
September 17, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 234th District Court of Harris County, case number 2018-55632 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20874708) filed by Gateway Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Exhibit Index of Documents, #3 Exhibit Counsel of Record)(Heard, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Gateway Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph M Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Babatunde Peters
Represented By: Nhan Huynh Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?