Jones v. Davis

Petitioner: William Monterial Jones
Respondent: Director of TDCJ CID Lorie Davis and Lorie Davis
Case Number: 4:2018cv03284
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2018 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time time to file answer by Lorie Davis, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(San Miguel, Susan)
October 12, 2018 8 Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to Ken Paxton, executed on 10/9/2018 re: 7 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 11, 2018 9 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 10/9/2018 re: 7 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (SamanthaWarda, 4)
October 9, 2018 ***Delivery Confirmation; delivery date(s) 10/8/2018 re: 7 Document(s) Sent, filed. (dhansen, 4)
September 28, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER TO ANSWER; granting #3 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 25, 2018 5 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by William Monterial Jones, filed.(dperez, 3)
September 14, 2018 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William Monterial Jones, filed. (agould, 3)
September 14, 2018 3 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Monterial Jones, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2018. (agould, 3)
September 14, 2018 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (agould, 3)
September 14, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by William Monterial Jones.(agould, 3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #1 Envelope) (agould, 3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of TDCJ CID Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Susan San Miguel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Monterial Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?