Southwest Key Programs, Inc. v. City Of Houston
Plaintiff: Southwest Key Programs, Inc.
Defendant: City Of Houston
Case Number: 4:2018cv03289
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Declaratory Action and Request for Speedy Hearing Pursuant to FRCP 57 by Southwest Key Programs, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Saldana, #2 Exhibit 2018.05.29 Application for Occupancy, #3 Exhibit Screen Shots of City Website, #4 Exhibit Operational Permits, #5 Exhibit Article - Immigrant Children's Shelter Considered, #6 Exhibit Article - Separated at the Border, #7 Exhibit Article - I Can't Support It, #8 Exhibit McLeod Email, #9 Exhibit 2018.06.21 Press Release, #10 Exhibit 2018.06.26 Acceptance Letter, #11 Exhibit Form 2936, #12 Exhibit 2018.08.16 Pena Letter, #13 Affidavit Declaration of H. Caton, #14 Exhibit 2018.09.05 Certificate of Receipt of Application, #15 Exhibit Child-Care Inspection Form, #16 Exhibit S. Turner Tweets, #17 Exhibit Bernstein Email, #18 Exhibit Doors at Casa Sunzal, #19 Exhibit Building Code Commentary Excerpts, #20 Exhibit Flores Settlement)(Gleen, Laura)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City Of Houston, filed.(Briscoe, Tiffany)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by City Of Houston, filed.(Briscoe, Tiffany)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Southwest Key Programs, Inc., filed.(Lindley, James)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to City Of Houston served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018, filed.(Lindley, James)
September 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to City Of Houston. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(mmapps, 4)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Gleen on behalf of Southwest Key Programs, Inc., filed. (Gleen, Laura)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to City Of Houston, filed.(Lindley, James)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Of Houston (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20876849) filed by Southwest Key Programs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lindley, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwest Key Programs, Inc. v. City Of Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Key Programs, Inc.
Represented By: James Robinson Lindley
Represented By: Laura N Gleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Houston
Represented By: Tiffany Bingham Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?