Emmert Industrial Corp dba Emmert International v. Three Auxiliary Boilers Nos. 6301, 6202 and 6303 et al

Plaintiff: Emmert Industrial Corp dba Emmert International
Defendant: Three Auxiliary Boilers Nos. 6301, 6202 and 6303, Fracht FWO, Inc. dba Fracht USA and Macchi, Division of Sofinter S.P.A
Case Number: 4:2018cv03305
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2018 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Emmert Industrial Corp dba Emmert International.(Mahley, Frederick)
October 30, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER granting #3 Motion for Kenneth C. Bauman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Emmert Industrial Corp dba Emmert International. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
October 30, 2018 3 MOTION for Kenneth C. Bauman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emmert Industrial Corp dba Emmert International, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2018. (Mahley, Frederick)
September 17, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20881580) filed by Emmert Industrial Corp dba Emmert International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mahley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmert Industrial Corp dba Emmert International v. Three Auxiliary Boilers Nos. 6301, 6202 and 6303 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Auxiliary Boilers Nos. 6301, 6202 and 6303
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fracht FWO, Inc. dba Fracht USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macchi, Division of Sofinter S.P.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmert Industrial Corp dba Emmert International
Represented By: Frederick William Mahley
Represented By: Kenneth Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?