Pendergraft et al

Appellant: Danielle Pauline Pendergraft and Scott Richard Pendergraft
Appellee: Network of Neighbors, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03311
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #5 Notice of Appeal to John Bruster Loyd. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 18-20718), filed.(dbenavides, 1)
November 8, 2018 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #5 Notice of Appeal, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
November 1, 2018 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 18-20718 re: #5 Notice of Appeal, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
October 25, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Appellants Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
October 24, 2018 Appeal Review Notes re: #5 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid. A motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending.No hearings were held in the case - no transcripts. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
October 24, 2018 7 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, #5 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
October 23, 2018 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #4 Order of Dismissal, by Danielle Pauline Pendergraft & Scott Richard Pendergraft, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
October 10, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. The Court DISMISSES with prejudice this appeal as it seeks to appeal issues that have been unfavorably resolved against the debtors/appellants or should have been raised in the first appeal. Case terminated on October 10, 2018. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
October 1, 2018 3 CLERKS NOTICE of Deficiencies in Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties notified., filed. (rwestmoreland, 4)
September 17, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bruster Loyd on behalf of Network of Neighbors, Inc., filed. (Loyd, John)
September 17, 2018 *** Appeal was not filed timely. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
September 17, 2018 1 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 9/7/2018, Scott and Danielle Pendergraft filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Hoyt, Civil Action 4:18-cv-3311. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendergraft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Danielle Pauline Pendergraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Scott Richard Pendergraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Network of Neighbors, Inc.
Represented By: John Bruster Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?