Lugo v. Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston et al
Plaintiff: Imelda Luna and Monica Lugo
Defendant: 620 E 6 1/2, LLC, Gary L Mosley, Austin Group Property, LLC, Rusty Nail Saloon, LLC, Low Brow Bar and Grill, LLC, TRK Holdings, LLC, Canyon Creek Cafe, LLC, Cedar Creek Cafe, LLC, Piggys Tavern, LLC, Mosley Hill Country Group, LLC, Dry Creek Group, LLC, Creek-Yale Street, LLC, TRK T007, LLC, Lakesidetrails Management Group, LLC, The Creek Group Company, PRK227, LLC, SLI 257, LLC, Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston, LLC, f/k/a Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston, Inc., d/b/a CRS Texas, 3119 White Oak, LLC, Onion Creek, LLC and Piggy's Tavern, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv03747
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston, LLC, f/k/a Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston, Inc., d/b/a CRS Texas, filed.(Touchstone, W)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by 3119 White Oak, LLC, 620 E 6 1/2, LLC, Austin Group Property, LLC, Canyon Creek Cafe, LLC, Cedar Creek Cafe, LLC, Creek-Yale Street, LLC, Dry Creek Group, LLC, Lakesidetrails Management Group, LLC, Low Brow Bar and Grill, LLC, Gary L Mosley, Mosley Hill Country Group, LLC, Onion Creek, LLC, PRK227, LLC, Piggy's Tavern, LLC, Rusty Nail Saloon, LLC, SLI 257, LLC, TRK Holdings, LLC, TRK T007, LLC, The Creek Group Company, filed.(Carbo, C)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 3119 White Oak, LLC, 620 E 6 1/2, LLC, Austin Group Property, LLC, Canyon Creek Cafe, LLC, Cedar Creek Cafe, LLC, Creek-Yale Street, LLC, Dry Creek Group, LLC, Lakesidetrails Management Group, LLC, Low Brow Bar and Grill, LLC, Gary L Mosley, Mosley Hill Country Group, LLC, Onion Creek, LLC, PRK227, LLC, Piggy's Tavern, LLC, Rusty Nail Saloon, LLC, SLI 257, LLC, TRK Holdings, LLC, TRK T007, LLC, The Creek Group Company, filed.(Carbo, C)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston, LLC, f/k/a Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston, Inc., d/b/a CRS Texas, filed.(Touchstone, W)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION re: Enlargement Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint Under the Fair Labor Standards Act by 3119 White Oak, LLC, 620 E 6 1/2, LLC, Austin Group Property, LLC, Canyon Creek Cafe, LLC, Cedar Creek Cafe, LLC, Creek-Yale Street, LLC, Dry Creek Group, LLC, Lakesidetrails Management Group, LLC, Low Brow Bar and Grill, LLC, Gary L Mosley, Mosley Hill Country Group, LLC, Onion Creek, LLC, PRK227, LLC, Piggy's Tavern, LLC, Rusty Nail Saloon, LLC, SLI 257, LLC, TRK Holdings, LLC, TRK T007, LLC, The Creek Group Company, filed.(Carbo, C)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Monica Lugo, Imelda Luna, filed.(Starzyk, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
October 11, 2018 Summons Issued as to 3119 White Oak, LLC, 620 E 6 1/2, LLC, Austin Group Property, LLC, Canyon Creek Cafe, LLC, Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston, LLC, f/k/a Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston, Inc., d/b/a CRS Texas, Cedar Creek Cafe, LLC, Creek-Yale Street, LLC, Dry Creek Group, LLC, Lakesidetrails Management Group, LLC, Low Brow Bar and Grill, LLC, Gary L Mosley, Mosley Hill Country Group, LLC, Onion Creek, LLC, PRK227, LLC, Piggys Tavern, LLC, Rusty Nail Saloon, LLC, SLI 257, LLC, TRK Holdings, LLC, TRK T007, LLC, The Creek Group Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Starzyk, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21054504) filed by Monica Lugo, Imelda Luna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Starzyk, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lugo v. Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 620 E 6 1/2, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L Mosley
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Group Property, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Nail Saloon, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Low Brow Bar and Grill, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRK Holdings, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Creek Cafe, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Creek Cafe, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piggys Tavern, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosley Hill Country Group, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dry Creek Group, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creek-Yale Street, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRK T007, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakesidetrails Management Group, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Creek Group Company
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRK227, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLI 257, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston, LLC, f/k/a Cash Register Sales & Service of Houston, Inc., d/b/a CRS Texas
Represented By: W Earl Touchstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3119 White Oak, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onion Creek, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piggy's Tavern, LLC
Represented By: C Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imelda Luna
Represented By: Michael A Starzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Lugo
Represented By: Michael A Starzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?