Zero CO2, LLC et al v. myGIG, LTD et al

Plaintiff: EOR TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS, INC, ZERO CO2, LLC and EOR Technology Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: RENE MUELLER, Paul Bagley, DYNAMIC VALUE PARTNERS AG, GREG ERWIN, myGIG, LTD, FEDSTAR ENERGY, LLC, FEDSTAR OIL RECOVERY TECHNOLOGIES, INC, FEDSTAR OIL RECOVERY TECHNOLOGIES, LLC and Fedstar Oil Recovery Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03786
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice. Case terminated on 12/03/2018. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4)
December 2, 2018 4 NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by EOR Technology Holdings, Inc., Zero CO2, LLC, filed. (Sibley, Joe)
November 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to Paul Bagley, Dynamic Value Partners AG, Greg Erwin, Fedstar Energy, LLC, Fedstar Oil Recovery Technologies, Inc., Fedstar Oil Recovery Technologies, LLC, Rene Mueller, myGIG, LTD. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4)
November 15, 2018 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation, #4 Continuation, #5 Continuation, #6 Continuation, #7 Continuation)(Sibley, Joe)
October 15, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 02:45 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21067444) filed by EOR TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS, INC, ZERO CO2, LLC.(Sibley, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zero CO2, LLC et al v. myGIG, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENE MUELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DYNAMIC VALUE PARTNERS AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG ERWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: myGIG, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDSTAR ENERGY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDSTAR OIL RECOVERY TECHNOLOGIES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDSTAR OIL RECOVERY TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedstar Oil Recovery Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EOR TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS, INC
Represented By: Joe Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZERO CO2, LLC
Represented By: Joe Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EOR Technology Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Joe Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?