Soria v. American Security Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Maria D. Soria
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv03805
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Maria D. Soria, filed.(Gerguis, Maria)
November 21, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Maria D. Soria, filed.(Gerguis, Maria)
November 15, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion for Continuance Initial Conference reset for 1/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 15, 2018 6 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by American Security Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aiken, Bradley)
November 13, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Continuance Responses due by 12/12/2018..(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
November 12, 2018 5 NOTICE Joint Notice Regarding Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by American Security Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aiken, Bradley)
October 15, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 15, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 12, 2018 2 NOTICE of Removal to Plaintiff re: #1 Notice of Removal, by American Security Insurance Company, filed. (Aiken, Bradley)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 400th Judicial District Court of Fort Bend County, Texas, case number 18-DCV-254941 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21073589) filed by American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Aiken, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soria v. American Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D. Soria
Represented By: Maria Rizkalla Gerguis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley J Aiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?