RooR International BV et al v. Smoke Screens Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and RooR International BV
Defendant: Rahul Mitera, Harpreet Kalsi and Smoke Screens Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv03839
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc., filed.(Jacoby, Andrew)
October 22, 2018 Summons Issued as to Harpreet Kalsi, Rahul Mitera, Smoke Screens Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(pyebernetsky, 4)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Harpreet Kalsi, Rahul Mitera, Smoke Screens Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Jacoby, Andrew)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harpreet Kalsi, Rahul Mitera, Smoke Screens Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21092937) filed by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Jacoby, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RooR International BV et al v. Smoke Screens Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Karl Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International BV
Represented By: Andrew Karl Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahul Mitera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpreet Kalsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smoke Screens Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?