RLB Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: RLB Contracting, Inc.
Claimant: Unknown Claimants
Counter Defendant: Genesis Energy, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03844
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Claim, COUNTERCLAIM against Genesis Energy, L.P. by RLB Contracting, Inc., filed.(Breitenwischer, Scott)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Publication by RLB Contracting, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Branca, Richard)
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Genesis Energy, L.P., filed.(Streich, Michael)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 Affidavit of Publication - Houston Chronicle by RLB Contracting, Inc., filed.(Breitenwischer, Scott)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 CLAIM filed by Genesis Energy, L.P..(Streich, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Genesis Energy, L.P., filed.(Streich, Michael)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by RLB Contracting, Inc., filed.(Branca, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION OF VALUE, AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF MONITION AND STAY (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by RLB Contracting, Inc., filed.(Branca, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 2/28/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Initial Order on Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability by RLB Contracting, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Branca, Richard)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION re: Ad Interim Stipulation of Value by RLB Contracting, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Branca, Richard)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RLB Contracting, Inc., filed.(Branca, Richard)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Claimants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21094615) filed by RLB Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Breitenwischer, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RLB Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RLB Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Anthony Branca
Represented By: Scott Robert Breitenwischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Unknown Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Genesis Energy, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Edward Streich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?