Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals LLC et al
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LP, Kinder Morgan Bulk Terminals, LLC and Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv03951
Filed: October 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Referring Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals LLC served on 11/12/2018, answer due 1/11/2019, filed.(Chaney, Tanya)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LP served on 11/12/2018, answer due 1/11/2019, filed.(Chaney, Tanya)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kinder Morgan Bulk Terminals, LLC served on 11/12/2018, answer due 1/11/2019, filed.(Chaney, Tanya)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 Docketed in Error - REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service as to Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals LLC sent on 11/12/2018 by Union Pacific Railroad Company, filed.(Chaney, Tanya) Modified on 12/18/2018 (hlerma, 4).
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Anthony J. Cuva to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Anthony J. Cuva to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kinder Morgan Bulk Terminals, LLC, Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LP, Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2019. (Hetherington, Thomas)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (leddins, 4)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECUSAL ORDER. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
October 20, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Pacific Railroad Company identifying Union Pacific Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Chaney, Tanya)
October 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21120541) filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chaney, Tanya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LP
Represented By: Thomas Francis Hetherington
Represented By: Anthony J Cuva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Bulk Terminals, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Francis Hetherington
Represented By: Anthony J Cuva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals LLC
Represented By: Thomas Francis Hetherington
Represented By: Anthony J Cuva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Tanya Lynn Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?