Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC v. Griffin 3L et al
Plaintiff: Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC
Defendant: Griffin 4T and Griffin 3L
Case Number: 4:2018cv04164
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Dismiss. Case terminated on 11/30/18.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #3 Order, #1 Complaint, Without Prejudice by Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order of Dismissal)(Slifer, LeElle)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC, filed.(Slifer, LeElle)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 STATEMENT of Interest by Griffin 3L, Griffin 4T, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Freeman, Mark)
November 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER allowing movement and repairs of vessel.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4)
November 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER allowing loading of Cargo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Permit Loading and/or Unloading of Cargo by Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Allowing Loading and/or Unloading of Cargo)(Slifer, LeElle)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Permit Movement and Repairs of Vessels by Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Allowing Movement and Repairs of Vessels)(Slifer, LeElle)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Issuance of Order and Warrant for Arrest (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(thanniable, 4)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Issuance of Warrant by Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Issuance of Order and Warrant for Arrest)(Slifer, LeElle)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Griffin 3L, Griffin 4T (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21207583) filed by Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification of In Rem Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Slifer, LeElle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC v. Griffin 3L et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin 4T
Represented By: Mark Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin 3L
Represented By: Mark Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stonebriar Commercial Finance LLC
Represented By: LeElle B Slifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?