Estate of Shelley Mott, Deceased, by and through its Administratrix Stephanie Smith et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Shelley Mott, Deceased, by and through its Administratrix Stephanie Smith, Hiram Mott and Glenda Mott
Defendant: Visteon Corp., Fabtech Industries Inc, Automotive Components Holding LLC, Bayshore Chrysler aka Wisch Motors, Inc. and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv04213
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Visteon Corp., filed.(Tippetts, David)
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Estate of Shelley Mott, Deceased, by and through its Administratrix Stephanie Smith, Glenda Mott, Hiram Mott, filed.(Sheller, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Thompson on behalf of Fabtech Industries Inc, filed. (Reilley, Steven)
December 10, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fabtech Industries Inc, filed.(Reilley, Steven)
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE VED ACTION by FCA US LLC, filed. (Sonnier, G.)
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 SURREPLY to #5 MOTION to Remand, #6 MOTION to Supplement Plaintiff's Motion to Remand as to #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by FCA US LLC. (Sonnier, G.)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 2/28/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
December 2, 2018 Filing 13 Supplemental REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Supplement Plaintiff's Motion to Remand as to #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by Estate of Shelley Mott, Deceased, by and through its Administratrix Stephanie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit To Reply to Def Response)(Sheller, David)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 JOINDER in #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Remand, filed by Fabtech Industries Inc. (Reilley, Steven)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re: #5 MOTION to Remand, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Remand, #6 MOTION to Supplement Plaintiff's Motion to Remand as to #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pearson, Chris)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Fabtech Industries Inc, filed.(Reilley, Steven)
November 18, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Order to Remand re: #6 MOTION to Supplement Plaintiff's Motion to Remand as to #5 MOTION to Remand, filed.(Sheller, David)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT IN REMOVED CASE re: #4 Order in Removed Cases - FORM - Miller by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Supplement Plaintiff's Motion to Remand as to #5 MOTION to Remand by Estate of Shelley Mott, Deceased, by and through its Administratrix Stephanie Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/6/2018. (Sheller, David)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Estate of Shelley Mott, Deceased, by and through its Administratrix Stephanie Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2018. (Sheller, David)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, Harris County, case number 2018-65708 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21231765) filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit (s) A-O)(Sonnier, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Shelley Mott, Deceased, by and through its Administratrix Stephanie Smith et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visteon Corp.
Represented By: David R Tippetts
Represented By: Kelley Maria Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabtech Industries Inc
Represented By: Steven Scott Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automotive Components Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayshore Chrysler aka Wisch Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: G. Robert Sonnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Shelley Mott, Deceased, by and through its Administratrix Stephanie Smith
Represented By: David Leigh Sheller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiram Mott
Represented By: David Leigh Sheller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Mott
Represented By: David Leigh Sheller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?