Chavez v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Lynn Chavez
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Gynecare Worldwide and Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv04285
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amy Lynn Chavez, filed.(Dunken, Bert)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc., filed.(Gallagher, Kathleen)
November 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 2nd Summons)(Dunken, Bert)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21260262) filed by Amy Lynn Chavez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Ethicon Summons, #3 Supplement J & J Summons)(Dunken, Bert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen A Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gynecare Worldwide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen A Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lynn Chavez
Represented By: Bert Tarrant Dunken, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?