National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Norfolk Southern Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv04451
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 11707
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Matthew J. Tinnelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2019. (Shivers, Craig)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Christopher J. Merrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2019. (Shivers, Craig)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Jeffrey D. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Norfolk Southern Railway Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2019. (Shivers, Craig)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019, filed.(Heilig, Justin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Norfolk Southern Corporation served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019, filed.(Heilig, Justin)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Heilig on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, filed. (Heilig, Justin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Saville, Jr. on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, filed. (Saville, James)
November 27, 2018 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA identifying American International Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Martin, Dana)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company, filed.(Martin, Dana)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Norfolk Southern Corporation, filed.(Martin, Dana)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21339286) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: Dana Keith Martin
Represented By: James A Saville, Jr
Represented By: Justin M Heilig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?