Evans v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Andre Evans
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank USA, NA
Case Number: 4:2018cv04452
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Tipper-McWhorter on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank USA, NA, filed. (Tipper-McWhorter, Catherine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Deadline to Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank USA, NA, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomsen, Jennifer)
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time of Deadline to Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank USA, NA, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomsen, Jennifer)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER DENYING re: #11 AMENDED #9 MOTION MOTION to Dismiss #10 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed.(Evans, Andre)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 AMENDED #9 MOTION MOTION to Dismiss #10 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed by Andre Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Rewards Account Summary, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Chase Ultimate Rewards Rules and Regulations, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Services Unavailable Notification Email, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Credit Shout Article 4/2/10, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Street Directory Article, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Chase's 8/14/10 Rewards Bonus email)(Evans, Andre)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 2/28/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED #9 MOTION( Motion Docket Date 1/22/2019.), MOTION to Dismiss #10 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank USA, NA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order)(Tomsen, Jennifer)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Andre Evans.(Evans, Andre)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Andre Evans's Complaint by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomsen, Jennifer)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., filed.(Tomsen, Jennifer)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., filed.(Tomsen, Jennifer)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Gray H Miller. Judge Andrew S Hanen no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (jguajardo, 4)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Andrew S Hanen recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Chase Bank USA, N.A. 12/13/2018; JP Morgan Chase & Co. 12/13/2018.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomsen, Jennifer)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 129th Judicial District Court Harris County, Texas, case number 2018-78329 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21339786) filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tomsen, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Jennifer Tomsen
Represented By: Catherine Tipper-McWhorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Jennifer Tomsen
Represented By: Catherine Tipper-McWhorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank USA, NA
Represented By: Catherine Tipper-McWhorter
Represented By: Jennifer Tomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Evans
Represented By: Andre D'Shawn Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?