Marek et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Bruce Marek and Katherin Marek
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2018cv04615
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Proof of Service-Summons in a Civil Action by Bruce Marek, Katherin Marek, filed.(Gordon, Steven)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bruce Marek, Katherin Marek, filed.(Gordon, Steven)
December 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Summons in a Civil Action by Bruce Marek, Katherin Marek, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addresses for Defendant, #2 Supplement Note to Clerk)(Gordon, Steven)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21421829) filed by Bruce Marek, Katherin Marek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Gordon, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marek et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Marek
Represented By: Steven L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherin Marek
Represented By: Steven L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?