Marek et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Paul A Marek and Katherine Marek
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2018cv04617
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 6 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/22/2019 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
December 21, 2018 5 Proof of Service-Summons in a Civil Action by Katherine Marek, Paul A Marek, filed.(Gordon, Steven)
December 21, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Katherine Marek, Paul A Marek, filed.(Gordon, Steven)
December 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
December 11, 2018 3 Summons in a Civil Action by Katherine Marek, Paul A Marek, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Addresses for Defendant, #2 Supplement Note to Clerk)(Gordon, Steven)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21422080) filed by Paul A Marek, Katherine Marek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Gordon, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marek et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A Marek
Represented By: Steven L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Marek
Represented By: Steven L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?