Oppman et al v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: William Oppman and Cassandra Oppman
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Michael Loudermilk and Mike Boone
Case Number: 4:2018cv04710
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilkins, Greg)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Cassandra Oppman, William Oppman, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Abstain & Remand)(Wilson, Chad)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Cassandra Oppman, William Oppman, filed. (Wilson, Chad)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cassandra Oppman, William Oppman, filed.(Wilson, Chad)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 03:45 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 First AMENDED ANSWER to by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed. (Wilkins, Greg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Wilkins, Greg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 400th Judicial District Court, case number 18-DCV-257218 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21468977) filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Wilkins, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppman et al v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Oppman
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Oppman
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Represented By: Tara Lace Peveto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Greg C Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Loudermilk
Represented By: Greg C Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Boone
Represented By: Greg C Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?