Atkinson v. Memorial Hermann Health System
Plaintiff: Benita Atkinson
Defendant: Memorial Hermann Health System
Case Number: 4:2019cv00162
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Responsive Pleading ; Answer due for Memorial Hermann Health System by 3/22/2019. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Responsive Pleading by Memorial Hermann Health System, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Kelley)
February 7, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to Memorial Hermann Health System due to these deficiencies: Summons already issued for Defendant. See Dkt Entry #5 . Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Memorial Hermann Health System, filed.(Murphy, Marjorie)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Memorial Hermann Health System. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Memorial Hermann Health System, filed.(Murphy, Marjorie)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Benita Atkinson, filed.(Murphy, Marjorie)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Memorial Hermann Health System (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21660385) filed by Benita Atkinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Marjorie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkinson v. Memorial Hermann Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benita Atkinson
Represented By: Marjorie A Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Hermann Health System
Represented By: Kelley Riddle Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?