Bank of America, N.A. v. P^2MG, LLC et al

Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A and Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: P^2MG, LLC and Michael E Nelson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00169
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Service, filed.(Purcell, Bradley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Michael E Nelson served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019, filed.(Purcell, Bradley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to P2MG, LLC served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019, filed.(Purcell, Bradley)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 08:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Bank of America Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Purcell, Bradley)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Reassignment. Parties notified, filed. (gkelner, 4)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge Kenneth M Hoyt for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Michael E Nelson, P2MG, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sanderson, 4)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Michael E Nelson, filed.(Purcell, Bradley)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to P2MG, LLC, filed.(Purcell, Bradley)
January 17, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to Michael E Nelson, P2MG, LLC Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies Two defts listed on the same summon by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Coversheet by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A, filed.(Aurzada, Keith)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Aurzada, Keith)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21667217) filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.(Aurzada, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. P^2MG, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P^2MG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A
Represented By: Keith Miles Aurzada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Keith Miles Aurzada
Represented By: Bradley James Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?