Van Winkle v. Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P.

Plaintiff: James Van Winkle
Defendant: Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00205
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by James Van Winkle, filed.(Fuller, John)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint ; Answer due for Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P. 4/2/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fulcher, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P., filed.(Mihaly, Roni)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019, filed.(Fuller, John)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P., filed.(Fuller, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hcarr, 4)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 5/1/2019 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21683155) filed by James Van Winkle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Smeberg, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Winkle v. Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Van Winkle
Represented By: Ronald Julius Smeberg
Represented By: John Paul Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Realty Group -- Conroe, L.P.
Represented By: Roni Sunderman Mihaly
Represented By: Joseph Alan Charles Fulcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?