Van Winkle v. CDT Property Company

Plaintiff: James Van Winkle
Defendant: CDT Property Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00207
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Initial Conference by CDT Property Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gagnon, Joseph)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Scott C. Fanning to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Steve A. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Scott Fanning to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CDT Property Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2019. (Gagnon, Joseph)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Steve A. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CDT Property Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2019. (Gagnon, Joseph)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Richard B Schiro terminated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CDT Property Company, filed.(Gagnon, Joseph)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph Gagnon in place of Richard B. Schiro by CDT Property Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gagnon, Joseph)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CDT Property Company, filed.(Schiro, Richard)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to CDT Property Company served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019, filed.(Fuller, John)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by James Van Winkle, filed.(Fuller, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CDT Property Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hcarr, 4)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CDT Property Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21683237) filed by James Van Winkle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Smeberg, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Winkle v. CDT Property Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Van Winkle
Represented By: Ronald Julius Smeberg
Represented By: John Paul Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDT Property Company
Represented By: Joseph W. Gagnon
Represented By: Scott C Fanning
Represented By: Richard B Schiro
Represented By: Steve A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?