Brown v. Miah et al

Plaintiff: Sorola Brown
Defendant: Mohammed Surj Miah and BWS Humble Center, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00208
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BWS Humble Center, LP, filed.(Laporte, Anthony)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to BWS Humble Center, LP served on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BWS Humble Center, LP, Mohammed Surj Miah. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Miah)(rguerrero, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sorola Brown, filed.(Schapiro, Douglas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Schapiro, Douglas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BWS Humble Center, LP, Mohammed Surj Miah (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21683882) filed by Sorola Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Miah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Surj Miah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWS Humble Center, LP
Represented By: Anthony Laurent Laporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sorola Brown
Represented By: Douglas Steven Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?