Fegans et al v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Plaintiff: Dellisha Fegans and Willie Fegans
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00209
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by United Parcel Service, Inc., filed.(Gosda, Douglas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by United Parcel Service, Inc., filed.(Gosda, Douglas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United Parcel Service, Inc., filed.(Gosda, Douglas)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, case number 2018-87563 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21684087) filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A1, #4 Exhibit A2, #5 Exhibit A3, #6 Exhibit A4, #7 Exhibit A5)(Gosda, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fegans et al v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Todd Gosda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dellisha Fegans
Represented By: Donald George DeSimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Fegans
Represented By: Donald George DeSimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?