Diana Sanchez Martinez v. Sergio Villalon Torres

Plaintiff: Diana Sanchez Martinez
Defendant: Sealed Defendant and Sergio Villalon Torres
Petitioner: SEALED FILER
Case Number: 4:2019cv00239
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Respondent shall be present on Friday, March 22, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. at the offices of Holland & Knight, located at 1100 Louisiana Street, #4300, Houston, Texas 77002, to have his deposition taken. There will be a court reporter and interpreter present and Respondent will be sworn and under oath. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Hittner. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/14/2019. Written order to issue. Oral Motion to Unseal Case heard and Granted. Appearances: Alfred Jason Huebinger, Jared L Young, Kristi Soppet, Sergio Villalon Torres pro se.(Court Reporter: Johnny Sanchez), filed.(ealexander, 4)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diana Sanchez Martinez, filed. (MarcelleLaBee, 4)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion for Show Cause Show Cause Hearing set for 3/14/2019 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 8A before Judge David Hittner(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Expedited Discovery and MOTION to Shorten Discovery Response Time by Diana Sanchez Martinez, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (MarcelleLaBee, 4)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Jason Huebinger, filed. (MarcelleLaBee, 4)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared L. Young on behalf of Diana Sanchez Martinez, filed. (MarcelleLaBee, 4)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT Civil Cover Sheet to Petition by SEALED FILER, filed. (Huebinger, Alfred)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT Request to Expedite Proceedings and Issue Show Cause Order Pursuant to Hague Convention Law by SEALED FILER, filed. (Huebinger, Alfred)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 Sealed Complaint filed by SEALED FILER. Receipt number 0541-21707554(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Soppet, Ashley) Modified on 1/25/2019 (rwestmoreland, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diana Sanchez Martinez v. Sergio Villalon Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealed Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Villalon Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SEALED FILER
Represented By: Alfred Jason Huebinger
Represented By: Ashley Kristine Soppet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Sanchez Martinez
Represented By: Alfred Jason Huebinger
Represented By: Jared L Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?