Villareal v. Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc.

Plaintiff: Patricia Villareal
Defendant: Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00300
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Ryan Roman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Michael C. Marsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Ryan Roman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/18/2019. (Rogers, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Michael C. Marsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/18/2019. (Rogers, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc. identifying Adtalem Global Education, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Rogers, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/18/2019. (Rogers, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019, filed.(Paranjpe, Tej)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Patricia Villareal, filed.(Paranjpe, Tej)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc., filed.(Paranjpe, Tej)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21743002) filed by Patricia Villareal.(Paranjpe, Tej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villareal v. Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Villareal
Represented By: Tej R Paranjpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chamberlain College of Nursing & Health Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: James Emery Rogers
Represented By: Ryan Roman
Represented By: Michael C. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?