United States of America v. SCS Construction Management, Inc.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: SCS Construction Management, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00398
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Substituted Service granting #2 .(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Service by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Substituted Service, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit)(Cersonsky, M)
February 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to SCS Construction Management, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to courier for plaintiff, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCS Construction Management, Inc. filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Indebtedness)(Cersonsky, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. SCS Construction Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCS Construction Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: M H Cersonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?