Precision Couplings, LLC v. SPCK Co., LTD et al
Plaintiff: PRECISION COUPLINGS, LLC
Defendant: SPCK USA, INC. and SPCK Co., LTD
Case Number: 4:2019cv00410
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Copy of Order filed in 4:19-cv-80. Unopposed Order Granting SPCK USA, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Consolidate. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SPCK USA, INC., filed.(Chae, Alexander)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Disqualify Alexander Chae and the law firm of Foley Gardere, Foley & Lardner LLP by Precision Couplings, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of John Hubbard)(Hightower, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th Judicial District Court, case number 2018-71593 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21813976) filed by SPCK USA, INC., SPCK Co., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit List of All Counsel of Record, #5 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Chae, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Couplings, LLC v. SPCK Co., LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPCK USA, INC.
Represented By: Alexander Carl Chae
Represented By: Jennifer Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPCK Co., LTD
Represented By: Alexander Carl Chae
Represented By: Jennifer Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRECISION COUPLINGS, LLC
Represented By: Tracy Alexandra Mutchler
Represented By: Timothy Ray Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?