Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Anthony
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, In Trust For Registered Holders of WAMU Asset-Backed Certificates WAMU Series 2007-HE1 Trust and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Carol R. Anthony
Case Number: 4:2019cv00688
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed.(Hord, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Carol R. Anthony, filed.(Bourda, Matthew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Carol R. Anthony, filed.(Bourda, Matthew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Carol R. Anthony, filed.(Lane, Robert)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed.(Hord, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carol R. Anthony. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 5/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Carol R. Anthony, filed.(Hord, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carol R. Anthony (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21949495) filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, In Trust For Registered Holders of WAMU Asset-Backed Certificates WAMU Series 2007-HE1 Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hord, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, In Trust For Registered Holders of WAMU Asset-Backed Certificates WAMU Series 2007-HE1 Trust
Represented By: Michael F Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Michael F Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol R. Anthony
Represented By: Matthew W. Bourda
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?