Halcyon Biomedical, Inc. v Glatt Air Techniques, Inc

Plaintiff: Halcyon Biomedical, Inc.
Defendant: Glatt Air Techniques, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00690
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Halcyon Biomedical, Inc., filed.(Dietrich, Fred)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint , filed by Halcyon Biomedical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Sean Gifford, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Dietrich, Fred)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Glatt Air Techniques, Inc. filed by Halcyon Biomedical, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Halcyon Biomedical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Sean Gifford, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Dietrich, Fred)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Glatt Air Techniques, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting MTD)(Sherry, Laura)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Glatt Air Techniques, Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019, filed.(Dietrich, Fred)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 6/10/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Glatt Air Techniques, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Glatt Air Techniques, Inc., filed.(Dietrich, Fred)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glatt Air Techniques, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21950088) filed by Halcyon Biomedical, Inc..(Dietrich, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halcyon Biomedical, Inc. v Glatt Air Techniques, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glatt Air Techniques, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Richards Sherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halcyon Biomedical, Inc.
Represented By: Fred Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?