Williams v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry D. Williams, II
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00782
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand, filed by Apple Inc.. (Trent, Thomas)
April 16, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, filed by Apple Inc.. (Trent, Thomas)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Continuance Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 6/3/2019. Initial Conference reset for 6/10/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
April 11, 2019 Filing 26 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III re: #18 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (aveliz, 5)
April 10, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Discovery Deadline and Initial Scheduling Conference by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trent, Thomas)
April 10, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 5/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. ( Notice was to correct error in setting type from de. 22)(leddins, 4) Modified on 4/10/2019 (leddins, 4).
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III as to Larry D. Williams, II re: #17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (mmarquez, 5)
April 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. In Chambers Conference reset for 5/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
April 4, 2019 Filing 21 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III as to Larry D. Williams, II re: #12 Notice of Resetting, filed. (ocasas, 7)
April 4, 2019 Filing 20 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III as to Larry D. Williams, II re: #11 Order,, filed. (ocasas, 7)
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, filed by Larry D. Williams, II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mattox, Tyne')
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Tiffany Cheung to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Claire C. Bonelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Tiffany Cheung to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/22/2019. (Trent, Thomas)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Claire C. Bonelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/22/2019. (Trent, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Christopher Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Apple Inc. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Christopher Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/19/2019. (Trent, Thomas)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/29/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Larry D. Williams, II, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Remand)(Mattox, Tyne')
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Motion to Dismiss ;( Responses to #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support due by 4/2/2019., Replies due by 4/16/2019). (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Motion to Dismiss by Larry D. Williams, II, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2019. (Mattox, Tyne')
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyne' N. Mattox on behalf of Larry D. Williams, II, filed. (Mattox, Tyne')
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III re: #3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Service of document No. 4 - Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support by Apple Inc., filed.(Taylor, Raphael)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple Inc., filed.(Taylor, Raphael)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2019. (Taylor, Raphael)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd Judicial District Court of Harris County Texas, case number 201906645 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21992989) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Apple Inc.'s Statement of Information, #3 Exhibit Annual Mean Wage, #4 Exhibit Index of Matters being Filed, #5 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit Certified State Court Filings)(Trent, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Trent
Represented By: Raphael Charles Taylor
Represented By: Claire C Bonelli
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Williams, II
Represented By: James C. Mattox, III
Represented By: Tyne' Nicole Mattox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?