Jaros v. State Of Texas et al

Plaintiff: Joshua L Jaros
Defendant: Jessica M Jaros, Ken Paxton, In His Official Capacity and State Of Texas
Case Number: 4:2019cv00804
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Remand, filed by Ken Paxton, In His Official Capacity, State Of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Graydon, Scot)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 Petitioner-Plaintiffs Response to AG Paxton Motion to Dismiss, filed by Joshua L Jaros. (kpicota, 4)
April 4, 2019 Filing 18 Opposed MOTION to Stay Scheduling Conference and Discovery by Ken Paxton, In His Official Capacity, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graydon, Scot)
March 21, 2019 Summons Re-Issued as to State Of Texas. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 Other EXHIBITS re: #16 MOTION to Remand by Ken Paxton, In His Official Capacity, State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(Graydon, Scot)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Ken Paxton, In His Official Capacity, State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graydon, Scot)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE Distinguishing Between the Two Basic Types of Removal; and, Motion for Issuance of Preliminary Relief in the Alternatives by Joshua L Jaros, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Pre-Emptive Constitutional Challenge to the Unlawful Discrimination of Separate Racial Classes via Georgia v. Rachel by Joshua L Jaros, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Constitutional Questions to Federal Statue 28 USC 1443 by Joshua L Jaros, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Special Pro Se Litigant Rights by Joshua L Jaros, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Judicial Disqualifications by Joshua L Jaros, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance (Civil) by Joshua L Jaros, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Joshua L Jaros, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Joshua L Jaros on Widespread Corruption, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice, or in the Alternative, Motion for Required Hearing on the Same Issues by Joshua L Jaros, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/27/2019. (pyebernetsky, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Constitutional Questions to Texas State Statutory Schemes by Joshua L Jaros, filed. (pyebernetsky, 4)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(pyebernetsky, 4)
March 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Jessica M Jaros, Ken Paxton, In His Official Capacity, State Of Texas. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(pyebernetsky, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law Clarifying Established Federal Jurisdiction by Joshua L Jaros, filed.(pyebernetsky, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pending Amendment of Petition-Complaint by Joshua L Jaros, filed. (pyebernetsky, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joshua L Jaros, filed.(pyebernetsky, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing fee: $400 re: #1 Notice of Removal,, receipt number HOU086888, filed. (pyebernetsky, 4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law 3 of Montgomery County, Texas, case number 14-05-05366 ( Filing fee $ 400) filed by Joshua L Jaros. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(pyebernetsky, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaros v. State Of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua L Jaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica M Jaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton, In His Official Capacity
Represented By: Scot M Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Texas
Represented By: Scot M Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?