Gilmore-Webster v. Bayou City Homebuyers Inc et al

Plaintiff: Kevin E Gilmore-Webster
Defendant: Bayou City Homebuyers Inc, South Land Title, LLC, Renters Warehouse, LLC, Tetrad Development, LLC and Ace Realty Partners
Case Number: 4:2019cv00887
Filed: March 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4)
March 12, 2019 Filing 57 Case transferred in from California Northern. Case Number 3:18-cv-05702; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
March 11, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of Texas-Houston Division. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/8/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ***Please disregard. Filed in error. See dkt. no. #56 .*** ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/8/2019.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019) Modified on 3/8/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2019 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 2/21/2019 re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and alternatively to Transfer Venue filed by Tetrad Development, LLC, Ace Realty Partners, #36 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by South Land Title, LLC, #28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Renters Warehouse, LLC, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bayou City Homebuyers Inc.FTR Time: 9:53-10:06. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thea Clark. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert John Kent, Jr (Kent, Robert) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13105912.) filed by South Land Title, LLC. (Doyle, Patrick) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TO DEFENDANT SOUTHLAND TITLE, LLC RE: ATTORNEY REPRESENTATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/19/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #48 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #48 Proposed Order filed by South Land Title, LLC (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 48 Motion to Appear by Telephone by South Land Title, LLC. (Doyle, Patrick) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/7/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Robinson. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 46 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by South Land Title, LLC.. (Doyle, Patrick) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Matthew Robinson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13064097.) filed by Renters Warehouse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Robinson, Matthew) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY in Support (re #28 MOTION to Dismiss) filed by Renters Warehouse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Powell, Holiday) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY in Support (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and alternatively to Transfer Venue ) filed byAce Realty Partners, Tetrad Development, LLC. (Brown, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 43 OBJECTIONS to #28 -1 Declaration of David Krull in Support of Defendant Renter's MOTION to Dismiss by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 42 DECLARATION in Opposition to #28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. (Related document(s) #28 ) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 41 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re Defendant Renters' #28 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and alternatively to Transfer Venue, #36 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #28 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTIONS HEARING (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant South Land Title, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/28/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and alternatively to Transfer Venue. Replies due by 1/17/2019. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Ace Realty Partners and Tetrad Development, LLCS' Motion to Dismiss and Alternatively Transfer Venue. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 36 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by South Land Title, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2019. Replies due by 2/4/2019. (Doyle, Patrick) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 35 Proposed Order re #34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Ace Realty Partners and Tetrad Development, LLCS' Motion to Dismiss and Alternatively Transfer Venue by Ace Realty Partners, Tetrad Development, LLC. (Brown, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Ace Realty Partners and Tetrad Development, LLCS' Motion to Dismiss and Alternatively Transfer Venue filed by Ace Realty Partners, Tetrad Development, LLC. (Brown, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 33 Proposed Order denying #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and alternatively to Transfer Venue by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION in Opposition to Ace Realty Partners and Tetrad Development, LLC.'s #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and alternatively to Transfer Venue filed by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. (Related document(s) #20 ) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and alternatively to Transfer Venue ) filed by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing reset for 2/14/2019 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTIONS HEARING AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/28/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 29 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ace Realty Partners, Tetrad Development, LLC.. (Brown, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Kevin E. Gilmore-Webster's Complaint for Insufficient Service of Process, Failure to State a Claim or, in the alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Renters Warehouse, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/16/2019. Replies due by 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Krull In Support of Defendant Renters Warehouse, LLCs Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Kevin E. Gilmore-Websters Complaint For Insufficient Service of Process, Failure To State A Claim Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(A); Memorandum of Points And Authorities, #(2) [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Renters Warehouse, LLC's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Kevin E. Gilmore-Websters Complaint For Insufficient Service of Process, Failure To State A Claim Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(A))(Powell, Holiday) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Renters Warehouse, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RW National Holdings, LLC for Renters Warehouse, LLC. (Powell, Holiday) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Renters Warehouse, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RW National Holdings, LLC for Renters Warehouse, LLC. (Powell, Holiday) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Renters Warehouse, LLC.. (Powell, Holiday) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 28, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) - Reply in Support of Bayou City's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bayou City Homebuyers Inc. (Brown, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing reset for 1/24/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 28, 2018 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Kevin E. Glimore-Webster in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byKevin E Gilmore-Webster. (Related document(s) #9 ) (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018) Modified on 12/27/2018 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2019: #1 Plaintiff's Opposition to Bay City Homebuyer's Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #9 ) (ahm, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Ace Realty Partners and Tetrad Development, LLC. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/3/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and alternatively to Transfer Venue filed by Ace Realty Partners, Tetrad Development, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/2/2019. Replies due by 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joe Appel, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #15 Administrative Motion to Reschedule Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/7/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT. (Related documents(s) #6 , #4 )(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Bayou City Homebuyers Inc. Responses due by 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kent, Robert) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jeremy Todd Brown. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bayou City Homebuyers Inc.. (Kent, Robert) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12922913.) filed by Bayou City Homebuyers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing)(Brown, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Bayou City Homebuyers Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/24/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 Declaration of James "Jim" Youngblood in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byBayou City Homebuyers Inc. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Kent, Robert) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bayou City Homebuyers Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 12/21/2018. Replies due by 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kent, Robert) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
November 23, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default and Final Judgment (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2018)
November 23, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default and Final Judgment (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2018)
November 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default and Final Judgment filed by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. Responses due by 12/7/2018. Replies due by 12/14/2018. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster re #4 MOTION for Entry of Default (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ace Realty Partners, Bayou City Homebuyers Inc, Renters Warehouse, LLC, South Land Title, LLC, Tetrad Development, LLC (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt No. 44611015706). Filed by Kevin E Gilmore-Webster. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore-Webster v. Bayou City Homebuyers Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin E Gilmore-Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayou City Homebuyers Inc
Represented By: Robert John Kent, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Todd Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Land Title, LLC
Represented By: Thea G. Clark
Represented By: Patrick F Doyle
Represented By: Robert John Kent, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renters Warehouse, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Crockett Robinson
Represented By: Holiday Dreessen Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetrad Development, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Todd Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Realty Partners
Represented By: Jeremy Todd Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?