Petrobras America, Inc. v. Samsung Heavy Industries Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01410
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER GRANTING 139 Unopposed MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER OF REQUEST PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE EVIDENCE CONVENTION TO OBTAIN EVIDENCE FROM RAUL SCHMIDT FELIPPE JUNIOR. Copy emailed to central authority of Portugal as instructed. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying 91 SEALED MOTION -Plaintiff Petrobras America Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Defendant Samsung Heavy Industries Co., Ltd.'s Counterclaim. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER entered DENYING 35 SEALED MOTION to Allow the Use of Certain Arbitration Documents in this Case or in the Alternative to Compel Production of the Documents. The court will hear argument on Petrobras's requests for production at the initial conference set for August 26, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. Petrobras must submit a premotion dispute letter on this issue no later than August 16, 2019. Samsung must respond no later than August 21, 2019, and Samsung may reply no later than August 23, 2019. Petrobrass deadline to file an amended complaint is continued pending the resolution of the parties discovery dispute.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ENTERED: Petrobas's motion to extend the deadline to file its amended complaint, (Docket Entry No. 31), is granted. Petrobas must file its amended complaint by August 12, 2019. The initial conference set for July 24, 2019, is reset to August 26, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petrobras America, Inc. v. Samsung Heavy Industries Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?