Savage SE Operations, LLC v. Wartsila North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SAVAGE SE OPERATIONS, LLC
Defendant: Wartsila Corporation and Wartsila North America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01681
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wartsila Corporation served on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019, filed.(Tillery, Jefferson)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wartsila North America, Inc. served on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019, filed.(Tillery, Jefferson)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22385153) filed by SAVAGE SE OPERATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tillery, Jefferson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savage SE Operations, LLC v. Wartsila North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wartsila Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wartsila North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAVAGE SE OPERATIONS, LLC
Represented By: Jefferson Randolph Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?