Lewis v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jason Lewis
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01684
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jason Lewis, filed.(Zimmerman, Brian)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Owens, Randall)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Serice in Removed Action by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Owens, Randall)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 126th Judicial District Harris County, case number 2019-21957 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22385968) filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Owens, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Randall Carroll Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Randall Carroll Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lewis
Represented By: Brian Weil Zimmerman
Represented By: Nicholas Jay Reisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?