Kruse v. British School of Houston, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Sally Kruse
Defendant: BSA Resource Solutions, LLC, British Schools of America, LLC, British Schools of Texas, LLC, British School of Houston, L.P., Nord Anglia Education, Inc. d/b/a British International School of Houston, British International School of Houston and Nord Anglia Education, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01685
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Benjamin Fryer to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for D. Jared Nobles to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for D. Jared Nobles to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BSA Resource Solutions, LLC, British International School of Houston, British School of Houston, L.P., British Schools of America, LLC, British Schools of Texas, LLC, Nord Anglia Education, Inc., filed. (Roppolo, Stephen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Benjamin Fryer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BSA Resource Solutions, LLC, British International School of Houston, British School of Houston, L.P., British Schools of America, LLC, British Schools of Texas, LLC, Nord Anglia Education, Inc., filed. (Roppolo, Stephen)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Charles T Jeremiah terminated.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BSA Resource Solutions, LLC, British International School of Houston, British School of Houston, L.P., British Schools of America, LLC, British Schools of Texas, LLC, Nord Anglia Education, Inc., filed.(Roppolo, Stephen)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by BSA Resource Solutions, LLC, British International School of Houston, British School of Houston, L.P., British Schools of America, LLC, British Schools of Texas, LLC, Nord Anglia Education, Inc., filed.(Roppolo, Stephen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Ashok Bail in place of Charles T. Jeremiah by Sally Kruse, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jeremiah, Charles)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 215th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-17012 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22385993) filed by Nord Anglia Education, Inc. d/b/a British International School of Houston, British Schools of Texas, LLC, British Schools of America, LLC, BSA Resource Solutions, LLC, British School of Houston, L.P., British International School of Houston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roppolo, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruse v. British School of Houston, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSA Resource Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J Roppolo
Represented By: Benjamin P Fryer
Represented By: D Jared Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Schools of America, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J Roppolo
Represented By: Benjamin P Fryer
Represented By: D Jared Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Schools of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J Roppolo
Represented By: Benjamin P Fryer
Represented By: D Jared Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British School of Houston, L.P.
Represented By: Stephen J Roppolo
Represented By: Benjamin P Fryer
Represented By: D Jared Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nord Anglia Education, Inc. d/b/a British International School of Houston
Represented By: Stephen J Roppolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British International School of Houston
Represented By: Stephen J Roppolo
Represented By: Benjamin P Fryer
Represented By: D Jared Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nord Anglia Education, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J Roppolo
Represented By: Benjamin P Fryer
Represented By: D Jared Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Kruse
Represented By: Ashok Bail
Represented By: Charles T Jeremiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?