Alila v. Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Lynda Alila
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01702
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING CASE (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case assigned to Chief Judge Lee Rosenthal. Judge Nancy F. Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Note: Notice re-docketed to include image. See entry at #8. NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (jdav, 4) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jdav, 4).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stevens, Gregg)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC, filed.(Stevens, Gregg)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC, filed.(Stevens, Gregg)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 269th Judicial District Court, Harris County, case number 2019-22457 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22391375) filed by Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Harris County Appraisal District Summary, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevens, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alila v. Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Alila
Represented By: Keith S Donati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Gregg D Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?