Sereal v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Sanders Sereal
Defendant: Paul Miller and Doug Bradley Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01710
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jon Randall Alworth re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
May 30, 2019 *** Re-mailed #2 Order for Conference to Atty Jon Randall Alworth at current address: 954 Heights Blvd., Houston, TX 77008-6911, filed. (sanderson, 4)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jon Randall Alworth as to Sanders Sereal re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (sanderson, 4)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Doug Bradley Trucking, Inc., Paul Miller, filed.(Ramey, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sanders Sereal, filed.(Carrigan, Mark)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Doug Bradley Trucking, Inc., Paul Miller, filed.(Ramey, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District, case number 2019-24011 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22394330) filed by Doug Bradley Trucking, Inc., Paul Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sereal v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Miller
Represented By: Robert Langdon Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Bradley Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Langdon Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanders Sereal
Represented By: Mark A Carrigan
Represented By: Jon Randall Alworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?